Harrison v. Smith
Plaintiff: Marcus L. Harrison
Defendant: E. Smith
Case Number: 3:2008cv04123
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (1) DENYING DISCOVERY AND PHOTOCOPY REQUESTS AND (2) EXTENDING DEADLINES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND SCHEDULING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus L. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?