Lockwood v. Conagra Foods Inc
Plaintiff: Margot Lockwood
Defendant: Conagra Foods Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv04151
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER extending time to answer to Class Action Complaint re 27 Stipulation filed by Conagra Foods Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER continuing case management conference re 16 Stipulation filed by Conagra Foods Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockwood v. Conagra Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margot Lockwood
Represented By: Ronald Brent Laba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?