MacConnach et al v. First Franklin Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chuck MacConnach and Walter Schmidt
Defendant: First Franklin Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. and Global Markets and Investment Banking Group
Case Number: 3:2008cv04154
Filed: September 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER rescheduling the resending of notice and final approval hearing re 59 Stipulation filed by Chuck MacConnach Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER for resending notice to class memebers and implementing a revised schedule re 56 Stipulation filed by Chuck MacConnach. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/10/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER continuing final approval hearing re 52 Stipulation filed by First Franklin Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Fairness Hearing set for 11/13/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER taking status conference off calendar re 37 Stipulation filed by First Franklin Financial Corporation, Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. Parties shall file either a joint motion for settlement approval or a status report informing the Court of their progress in finalizing the formal stipulation of settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re Confidentiality re 26 Stipulation filed by Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/14/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacConnach et al v. First Franklin Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuck MacConnach
Represented By: Justin Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Schmidt
Represented By: Justin Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Financial Corporation
Represented By: A. Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc.
Represented By: A. Michael Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Markets and Investment Banking Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?