June 30, 2010 |
Filing
242
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
240
ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2010 03:00 PM.ALL TRIAL DEADLINES VACATEDMotions terminated: 221 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Strike the Expert Reports of Clifford Kupperberg filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC, 225 MOTION to Exclude testimony of plaintiff's expert Charles Kuyk filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromedia Software LLC, 224 MOTION to Exclude testimony of plaintiff's expert Ronald Jost and Charles Kuyk filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromedia So ftware LLC, 211 MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Charles Kuyk [MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION] MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Defendants 39; Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Charles Kuyk [MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION] filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromedia Software LLC, 202 MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Defendants' Use of Evidence Related to Barry Hills MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude Defendants' Use of Evidence Related to Barry Hills filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC, [2 34] MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ronald Jost and Exhibits B, C and D in Support to Plaintiff's Opposition filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC, 223 MOTI ON to Preclude defendants' use of evidence related to Barry Hills filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC, 203 MOTION in Limine ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC's Motion to Exclude Testimony and Strike the Expert Reports of Clifford Kupperberg filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC, 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Preclude Defendants Use Of Evidence Related To Barry Hills; Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Exclude Testimony An d Strike The Expert Reports Of Clif filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromedia Software LLC, 238 MOTION for Leave to File Under Local Rule 7.9 Motion for Reconsideration Based on Change of Law filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromed ia Software LLC, 210 MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ronald Jost [MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION] MOTION in Limine [Daubert Motion] re Defendant s' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Ronald Jost [MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION] filed by Adobe Systems, Inc., Adobe Macromedia Software LLC, 230 MOTION to Seal Document 228 Memorandum in Opposition ,, 229 Declaration in Support,, Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Exclude Testimony of Plaint MOTION to Seal Document 228 Memorandum in Opposition ,, 229 Declaration in Support,, Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Exclude Testimony of Plaint MOTION to Seal Document 228 Memorandum in Opposition ,, 229 Declaration in Support,, Plaintiff's Motion Pursuant To Civ. L.R. 79-5(D) To File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Exclude Testimony of Plaint filed by ThinkVillage-Kiwi, LLC., (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
|
January 13, 2010 |
Filing
201
ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL re 186 , 197 , 199 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
|
November 16, 2009 |
Filing
182
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 123 , granting in part denying in part TVK's motion to strike 159 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing
138
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS[Docket Nos. 86, 88] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
|
September 9, 2009 |
Filing
116
Correct ORDER (continuing cmc to 10/30/09) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
90
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY REQUEST[Docket Nos. 75, 82] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
|
May 29, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Application of Culig. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/29/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
|
April 22, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER by Judge Illston granting 54 Motion ; continuing cmc to 6/5/09 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
|
April 1, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT 41 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
|
March 6, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUEST (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
|
January 14, 2009 |
Filing
38
ORDER re 37 . Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
|
December 30, 2008 |
Filing
36
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
|