Farpointe Data, Inc. v. Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID)
Plaintiff: Farpointe Data, Inc.
Defendant: Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID)
Case Number: 3:2008cv04236
Filed: September 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER extending time to file answer and to continue cmc re 27 Stipulation, filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID) Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/29/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER extending time to file answer and continuing initial CMC re 25 Stipulation filed by Farpointe Data, Inc., Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/15/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER extending time to file answer and continuing CMC re 23 Stipulation filed by Farpointe Data, Inc., Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID) Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting re 21 Stipulation Extending Time To File Answer; To Continue CMC filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID) Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Stipulation filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/4/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Stipulation, filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID) Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 08:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/18/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER extending time to file answer and continuing initial cmc re 15 Stipulation, filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/5/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting re 13 Stipulation Extending Time to File Answer to Complaint; Continue Initial CMC, filed by Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID) Answer to complaint due 2/3/09. Joint Report and Initial disclosures due 2/3/09 Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/7/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 5 Proposed Order filed by Farpointe Data, Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2009 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/15/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farpointe Data, Inc. v. Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farpointe Data, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Wireless Identifications Group, Inc. (AWID)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?