Brown v. Equifax, Experian & Transunion
Plaintiff: Augustus M. Brown, II
Defendant: Equifax and Experian & Transunion
Case Number: 3:2008cv04246
Filed: September 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT EQUIFAX; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Plaintiff's claims against Equifax are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEWIS P. PERLING PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 21, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 23 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Case Management Conference - Further, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,, Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/6/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/2/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CARA HERGENROETHER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel for defendant Equifax and plaintiff shall appear telephonically at the Case Management Conference on February 27, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN AND TRANSUNION. Plaintiff's claims against Experian and Transunion are dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to timely serve said defendants. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN AND TRANSUNION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than February 13, 2009, why plaintiff's claims against Experian and Transunion should not be dismissed for failure to serve them by January 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Equifax, Experian & Transunion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustus M. Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian & Transunion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?