Technology Licensing Company, Inc. v. Mustek, Inc.
Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Mustek, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04253
Filed: September 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation Of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (BY ONE WEEK) re 11 Stipulation filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc., Mustek, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 4, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Stipulation filed by Technology Licensing Company, Inc., Mustek, Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 15, 2009. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology Licensing Company, Inc. v. Mustek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology Licensing Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Wade Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustek, Inc.
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?