Coley et al v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Coley, Courtney Brown, Quincy Smith, Nolukwe Okoli and Larrie Noble, Jr.
Defendant: City of Oakland and Wayne Tucker
Case Number: 3:2008cv04255
Filed: September 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM & ORDER Re: Plaintiff Young's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/14/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying renewed motion to certify class, filed in C 05-3110 MHP; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/12/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Initial Case Management Conference to 1/12/2009 03:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/14/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coley et al v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Coley
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Brown
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Smith
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolukwe Okoli
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larrie Noble, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?