Edalati v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nazila Edalati
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv04354
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Notice of Settlement; Further Case Management Conference continued to 10/5/2009 03:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/24/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference reset for 8/24/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference to 1/5/2009 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/2/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edalati v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazila Edalati
Represented By: John Michael Riestenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Martin Elliot Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?