All Points Capital Corp. v. Arhitectural Metal Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: All Points Capital Corp.
Defendant: Arhitectural Metal Products, Inc., Pacific Rollforming, LLC, Ridgetop Hawaii, Inc. and Ridgetop Roofing and Gutter, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04394
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why defendant should not be directed to turn over its attorney fee award; enjoining defendant from disposing of the award. Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to submit response re 37 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration, or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Order Granting Summary Judgment not later than 9/24/09 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Vacating Hearing re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF P OINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by All Points Capital Corp. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue the case management conference from 3/19/2009 to 5/21/2009 at 3:30 P.M. re 28 filed by All Points Capital Corp. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/10/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 1/8/2009 to 3/19/2009 at 3:30 PM re 25 filed by All Points Capital Corp. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/30/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Points Capital Corp. v. Arhitectural Metal Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Points Capital Corp.
Represented By: David G. Bayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arhitectural Metal Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Rollforming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgetop Hawaii, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgetop Roofing and Gutter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?