Lam et al v. Mid-Century Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Carol Sui Man Lam and Lai Fong Lee
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company, Tak Tsui Insurance Agency and American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv04413
Filed: September 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 19 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER AS MOOT 28 . The court denies plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by American Security Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERROR - SEE #10 FOR CORRECT ATTACHMENT - STIPULATION AND ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by American Security Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008) Modified on 10/3/2008 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lam et al v. Mid-Century Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Sui Man Lam
Represented By: John N. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lai Fong Lee
Represented By: John N. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tak Tsui Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter D. Willson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?