Lopes v. City of Livermore, California et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Lopes
Defendant: City of Livermore, California, City of Livermore Police Department and City of Livermore Parks Dept
Case Number: 3:2008cv04433
Filed: September 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's first amended complaint is hereby DISMISSED without further leave to amend. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME. Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint, if any, no later than November 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The deadline to file a First Amended Complaint is October 31, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopes v. City of Livermore, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Livermore, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Livermore Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Livermore Parks Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?