Murray et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Murray, Robert McMeans, Richard Smid, Raymond Dolman and Beverley James Lowe
Defendant: General Electric Company, Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company, Todd Shipyards Corporation, Vought Aircraft Industries, Inc., Viad Corp., General Dynamics Corporation and Warren Pumps LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv04461
Filed: September 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re Voluntary Dismissal Of Entire Actions, Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/26/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO PLAINTIFFS FOR STATUS REPORT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER of substitution of counsel for defendant General Dynamics Copr. Attorney Edward R. Hugo for General Dynamics Corporation added. Attorney James Joseph O'Brien; Daniel Dennis O'Shea; Gabriel Anne Jackson and Lyudmila Fedorovna Logvin terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Case No. 13-937 MMC is referred to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer for consideration of whether the case is related to Murray, et al., v. General Electric Company, et al., No. C. 08-4461 CRB. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF JOSEPH MURRAY, ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER as to Plaintiff Beverly Lowe In Re: Asbestos Products Liability Litigation (NO. VI), MDL No. 875, REOPENING CASE. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, Case reopened. IN RE: ASBESTOS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.VI) MDL No.875. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/5/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. IN RE: ASBESTOS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.VI) MDL No. 875. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 1/27/09. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO CONTINUE. The Case Management Conference is continued to April 10, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT VIAD CORPORATION TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Murray
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McMeans
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Smid
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Dolman
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley James Lowe
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport News Shipbuilding and Dry Dock Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Shipyards Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vought Aircraft Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?