Wong et al v. Golden State Supply Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Wong and Carlos Suarez
Defendant: Golden State Supply Inc and General Parts Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04569
Filed: October 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 05:704 Labor Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/18/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT re 22 Notice (Other) filed by General Parts Inc., Golden State Supply Inc - Request to Appear Telephonically at the 4/24/9 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/20/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS AND FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wong et al v. Golden State Supply Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Wong
Represented By: Marco Palau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Suarez
Represented By: Marco Palau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Supply Inc
Represented By: Phillip J. Eskenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Parts Inc.
Represented By: Phillip J. Eskenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?