Center for Biological Diversity v. Kempthorne et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne and H. Dale Hall
Case Number: 3:2008cv04595
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 5, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND STAY OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/7/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Kempthorne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Melissa Gale Thrailkill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Dale Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?