Hawks v. Curry et al
Petitioner: Harold Harvey Hawks
Respondent: Ben Curry, Arnold Schwarzenegger and Board of Parole Hearings
Case Number: 3:2008cv04605
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON REMAND AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 4, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART 25 Motion to Stay. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Harold Harvey Hawks. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 22, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING 17 Supplemental Brief filed by Harold Harvey Hawks. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 30, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawks v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harold Harvey Hawks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Parole Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?