Maltz Associates, L.P. v. Hewitt Associates, LLC.
Plaintiff: Maltz Associates, L.P.
Defendant: Hewitt Associates, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2008cv04626
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/25/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/15/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 FIRST DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 28, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 53 filed by Hewitt Associates, LLC., Maltz Associates, L.P. The court trial shall be continued until February 1, 2, and 3, 2010 at 9:00 AM. Pretrial Conference is scheduled for January 21, 2010 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/15/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2009. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEADLINE re doc 32 filed by Maltz Associates,LP. MALP's time to file a letter with the court requesting leave to file a motion to compel fact discovery shall be extended to 7 court day s after counsel for MALP receives the complete transcript of the FRCP 30(b)(6) deposition of Hewitt, and if leave is granted, the motion shall be filed within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/29/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/17/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (exhibit A) and Defendant's answer filed on 10/10/2008 shall be the answer to the Complaint as so amended filed by Maltz Associates, L.P. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/5/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 selecting Private ADR through JAMS filed by Hewitt Associates, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/30/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maltz Associates, L.P. v. Hewitt Associates, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maltz Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Kenneth G. Hausman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewitt Associates, LLC.
Represented By: Karen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?