Schiff v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Schiff
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department and Heather Fong
Case Number: 3:2008cv04627
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 11-4016. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 128 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/12/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 107 motion for summary judgment; granting 129 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/8/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONDUCT EXPERT DISCOVERY re (216 in 4:10-cv-01051-PJH) Stipulation filed by Frederick Schiff, (163 in 4:08-cv-04627-PJH) Stipulation filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/15/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/5/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motions to Compel 66 79 in C08-4627, 92 109 in C10-1051; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 74 in C08-4627, 104 in C10-1051; DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 80 in C08-4627, 110 in C10-1051. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel. Hearing set for 3/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/15/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 58 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/10/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION re (72 in 4:10-cv-01051-PJH) Stipulation filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/112/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINES re (50 in 4:08-cv-04627-PJH) Stipulation filed by The City and County of San Francisco, (59 in 4:10-cv-01051-PJH) Stipulation filed by The City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/19/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 45 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/12/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE ATTORNEY PATRICK J. MANSHARDT'S UNAUTHORIZED PRACTIVE OF LAW re (42 in 4:08-cv-04627-PJH, 45 in 4:10-cv-01051-PJH) Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/17/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RELATED CASE ORDER re 38 Notice (Other) filed by Frederick Schiff. C 08-4627 PJH AND C 10-1051 JSW ARE RELATED Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT-OFF DATES re 35 Stipulation filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/22/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY AND MOTION CUT-OFF DATES re 33 Proposed Order filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/3/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 30 Stipulation, filed by The City and County of San Francisco, Heather Fong. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/28/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING FAILURE TO E-FILE re 1 Complaint, filed by Frederick Schiff. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/18/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER. Frederick Schiff v. City & County of San Francisco, et al., C-08-4627 PJH, is not related to Frederick Schiff v. City & County of San Francisco, et al., C-03-4345 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiff v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Schiff
Represented By: Patrick James Manshardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?