Kyriacou et al v. Peralta Community College District et al
Plaintiff: Kandy Kyriacou and Ojoma Omaga
Defendant: Peralta Community College District, Kerry Compton, Derek PIazza and Peter Simone
Case Number: 3:2008cv04630
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not infact occuured, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re: protective order (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CORRECTED ORDER continuing motion and cmc to 4/3/09 @ 9 AND 3 P.M. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER continuing motion to dismiss and cmc to 4/3/09 at 9 a.m. and 3 p.m., respectively.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting extension and continuing motion to 3/6/09 @ 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/20/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyriacou et al v. Peralta Community College District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandy Kyriacou
Represented By: Steven Noel Housley Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ojoma Omaga
Represented By: Steven Noel Housley Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peralta Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek PIazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?