United Van Lines, LLC v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: United Van Lines, LLC
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Edwards and Lisa Edwards
Case Number: 3:2008cv04635
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties are directed to attend a status conference on May 29, 2009 at 10:30 a.m., and to file a joint status conference statement no later than May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request to Appear by Telephone for Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/17/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY CASE PENDING ARBITRATION. The parties are ordered to proceed to mediation, in accordance with their stipulation filed December 19, 2008. The parties are ordered t o proceed, at the conclusion of the mediation process, to arbitration of the dispute at issue. The action is stayed pending completion of the arbitration proceedings, with the exception that the stay shall not apply to the above-referenced mediation process. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. By such denial, the Court is not requiring an appearance by out-of-state counsel; local counsel may appear on behalf of defendants at the hearing on the motion to dismiss or stay and, if necessary, at the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Matthew S. Zeiger is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Van Lines, LLC v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Gregg S. Garfinkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?