Williams et al v. United States Tennis Association et al
Plaintiff: LaDonna Williams and Paris Williams
Defendant: United States Tennis Association, Kennedy Davis, Patrice Davis, City of Alameda, Walter Tibbet and Harbor Bay Tennis Club
Case Number: 3:2008cv04698
Filed: October 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 64 Motion to Dismiss, granting 65 Motion to Dismiss, granting 69 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER closing file (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE BRIEFING AND HEARING DATES re 45 Request filed by LaDonna Williams. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/18/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Letter, filed by City of Alameda, Walter Tibbet. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE re 27 Order to Show Cause, 24 Order; ORDER RE SERVICE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/16/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/9/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING CMC; ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARINGS RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING OSC; ORDER RESCHEDULING CMC re 4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER VACATING 1/15/09 CMC; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/29/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/22/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. United States Tennis Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paris Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Tennis Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Tibbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Bay Tennis Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?