Loharsingh v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Malehki Loharsingh
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Heather Fong, Trapsi, Neves and Franco
Case Number: 3:2008cv04725
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/29/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 11, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 44 Joint Discovery Letter filed by City & County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference prev. set for 6/12/9 at 1:30 PM has been re- set for 7/10/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/12/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 27 Case Management Conference - Initial, Settlement Conference set for 1/13/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge HON. MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/13/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case] Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2009 at 01:30 PM, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/24/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loharsingh v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malehki Loharsingh
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trapsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?