Maldonado v. Chao

Plaintiff: Adrian A. Maldonado
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Case Number: 3:2008cv04761
Filed: October 16, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITION, DISMISSING CASE AND CLOSING FILE re 16 Stipulation filed by Elaine L. Chao. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 16, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC; CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND re 10 Stipulation filed by Elaine L. Chao. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
December 9, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE re 8 Stipulation filed by Elaine L. Chao. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/9/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian A. Maldonado
Represented By: Theresa A. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine L. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?