United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements at 671 Maud Avenue, San Leandro, California, APN #077-0520-024-02
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements at 671 Maud Avenue, San Leandro, California, APN #077-0520-024-02
Case Number: 3:2008cv04777
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER of FINAL SETTLEMENT RE: 1) Joining Issue; 2) Recognition and Settlement of Lienholders Claim, Order of Dismissal and Order of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/5/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 12/4/09 is continued to 2/5/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/30/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Claimant Dan Xia to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 11/19/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/4/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for Claimant Dan Xia to respond to the Complaint to 11/11/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/15/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to file a Claim and Response to the Complaint for Forfeiture (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Claimant Junmei Yan to file a claim and Respond to the Complaint to 9/16/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Claimant Junmei Yan to file a Claim and Response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/7/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Stipulation Extending Time for Claimant to File Claim and Response to the Complaint to 6/16/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/3/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009) Modified on 4/3/2009 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REQUEST AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/09 is continued to 6/26/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/20/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimant Dan Xia to resond to the complaint to 4/16/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for claimant Junmei Yan to respond to the complaint to 4/16/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/8/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Claimant to file Claim and Response to the Complaint to 1/16/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/5/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Claimant to File Claim and Response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements at 671 Maud Avenue, San Leandro, California, APN #077-0520-024-02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Susan B. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements at 671 Maud Avenue, San Leandro, California, APN #077-0520-024-02
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?