Palma v. Homecomings et al
Plaintiff: Mirla Palma
Defendant: Homecomings, MERS Inc. and Elizabeth Ogbomon
Case Number: 3:2008cv04780
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER 22 JUDGMENT: The Second Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008) Modified on 2/10/2009 (aaa, Court Staff).
December 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT: The Second Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED for failure to state a claim (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than January 9, 2009, why the First Amended Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than December 30, 2008, why her complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 8, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palma v. Homecomings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirla Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ogbomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?