Oritz v. Adams
Petitioner: Francisco Oritz
Respondent: D. G. Adams
Case Number: 3:2008cv04834
Filed: October 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Petitioner's traverse is due 12/18/09. No further extensions of this deadline will be permitted. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oritz v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Oritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?