Oliver v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Oliver, Joseph Batieste, Jr., Antoinette McCullough, Delandro Brown, Dannie Carter, Sr., Lawrence Graham and Mesiah Shaw
Defendant: City of Oakland and Karla Rush
Case Number: 3:2008cv04914
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Approval of Motion to Settle Non-Monetary Relief Claims, Including Putative Class Claims in the Matter of Oliver, et al. v. City of Oakland. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/15/2010 Withdrawing Attorney Terence J. Cassidy as co-counsel for Defendant City of Oakland in cases C-08-4914-TEH & C-08-4984-TEH. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION and ORDER for Pretrial Preparation: Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco for an estimated 5 da ys. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The matter is referred to Mag. Judge James for settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/01/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010) Modified on 10/1/2010 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR DEPOSIT OF MINOR'S SETTLEMENT FUNDS (Petitioner Sandra Phelps). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER allowing defense counsel to appear by phone at the case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/14/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER allowing telephonic appearance by plaintiffs' counsel at the case management conference on 06/14/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 3/8/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 43 Letter filed by Cheryl Hopkins, Nedya Shaw, Humberto Torres, Antoinette McCullough, Mesiah Shaw, Ricketa Lynn Matthews, Daniel Casey, N. O., Lawrence Graham, Reginald Oliver, Joseph Batieste, Jr., Dannie Carter, Sr., Nicole Jackson, Anthony Biggins, Grace Foster, Travis Hopkins, Delandro Brown, Dannie Carter, Jr. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 2/8/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief. No relief ordered at this time. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/23/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/04/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING leave to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/06/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re: Oakland Police Department's records. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/17/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Oliver
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Batieste, Jr.
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette McCullough
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delandro Brown
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannie Carter, Sr.
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Graham
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mesiah Shaw
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?