Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University v. Stanford Financial Group Company et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Defendant: Stanford Financial Group Company and Stanford Group Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv04950
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 115 Stipulation, filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 115 Stipulation, 74 MOTION to Dismiss a Portion of the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdic tion, 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 62 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can be Granted, 80 MOTION for Summary Judg ment 57 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction : Counterclaims due by 10/9/2009. Response to pending Discovery due by 10/2/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/25/2009 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Continuing hearing re 113 Stipulation, filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior Universit, re 74 MOTION to Dismiss 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 62 MOTION to Dismiss 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment 57 MOTION to Dismiss Discovery due by 9/4/2009. Motions Hearing set for 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 111 Stipulation, filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 111 Stipulation, 74 MOTION to Dismiss a Portion of the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 62 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can be Granted, 57 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/24/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/18/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER continuing hearings re 109 Stipulation, filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 109 Stipulation, 74 MOTION to Dismiss a Portion of the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-M atter Jurisdiction, 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 62 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can be Granted, 80 MOTION fo r Summary Judgment Partial, 57 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Responses due by 7/24/2009. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER extending time to respond re 107 Stipulation filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/4/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER continuing hearing to show cause re 105 Stipulation filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 105 Stipulation, 74 MOTION to Dismiss a Portion of the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 62 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can be Granted, [8 0] MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial, 57 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motions Hearing set for 6/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/29/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/24/2009 10:00 AM. Receiver adn Stanford are directed to file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement stating their respective positions and other matters provided by Local Rule 16-9 by 4/17/2009.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/25/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER extending time to respond to counterclaims re 86 Stipulation filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/24/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 83 Stipulation,, filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 83 Stipulation,, 74 MOTION to Dismiss a Portion of the First Amended Complaint for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdic tion, 66 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 62 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint For Failure to State a Claim on Which Relief Can be Granted, 80 MOTION for Summary Judg ment Partial, 57 MOTION to Dismiss in Part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for March 12, 2009 at 9:00a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/6/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 Stipulation, 19 MOTION to Dismiss in Part and to Stay in Part, 13 MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER extending time to respond to complaint re 10 Stipulation filed by Stanford Group Company, Stanford Financial Group Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University v. Stanford Financial Group Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Mit Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Financial Group Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Group Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?