Hicks v. Schafer
Plaintiff: Amahra Hicks
Defendant: Ed Schafer
Case Number: 3:2008cv04960
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT FOR COMPROMISE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER. Hicks v. Schafer, 07-0112 MMC, is related to Hicks v. Schafer, 08-4960 CRB. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amahra Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?