Jackson v. Hense
Plaintiff: Clifford L. Jackson, Jr.
Respondent: Lydia C. Hense
Case Number: 3:2008cv04974
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 23 , 25 PETITIONER'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 20 PETITIONER'S THIRD REQUEST FOR EXTENSION FO TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 PETITIONER'S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 11 , 15 PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Hense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford L. Jackson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lydia C. Hense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?