McGregor v. Cross Link, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bruce A. McGregor
Defendant: Cross Link, Inc., Westar Marine Services, Taurus Marine Inc. and M/V Ranger
Case Number: 3:2008cv05001
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Marine Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1333 Admiralty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 87 Motion in Limine (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Reinstating July 2, 2010 as a Trial Date (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/29/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Date for Filing and Serving Oppositions to Motions in Limine (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Plantifff's Substitution of Counsel and Order (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGregor v. Cross Link, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A. McGregor
Represented By: Kurt Leonard Micklow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Link, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westar Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taurus Marine Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Ranger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?