Atwood v. City of San Rafael et al
Plaintiff: Doane Atwood
Defendant: City of San Rafael, Matthew Odetto, Rolegio Leon, Robert Henkle, Richard Clary, Aaron Piombo and Embassey Suites Hotel
Case Number: 3:2008cv05002
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/18/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 8 Stipulation Extending Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 01:30 PM. Joint case management statement due: 6/5/2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 Stipulation filed by Embassey Suites Hotel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 4 Stipulation filed by Embassey Suites Hotel Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/13/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atwood v. City of San Rafael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doane Atwood
Represented By: Bruce William Nickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Rafael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Odetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolegio Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Henkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Piombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embassey Suites Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?