Bai v. Yeung et al
Plaintiff: Xiaofang Bai
Defendant: Mau Wan "Judy& Yeung, Sa Hua "Sharo Wang, "George" He Xiaohua, Perdura Inc., Discovery Builders, DS Mortgage Inc., Discovery Sales Inc., Leona LLC, Jason Sterling, John M. Cugia, Bank of America, Wells Fargo Bank and CCG Collection Servicing
Case Number: 3:2008cv05109
Filed: November 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/29/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Stipulation filed by Bank of America, 23 Proposed Order filed by Bank of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/23/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 13 Stipulation filed by Sa Hua "Sharo Wang. Signed by Judge James on 3/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/23/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009) Modified on 2/24/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Stipulation filed by Bank of America. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/29/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER extending time re 5 Stipulation filed by Sa Hua "Sharo Wang. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bai v. Yeung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaofang Bai
Represented By: Antonio Luis Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mau Wan "Judy& Yeung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sa Hua "Sharo Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "George" He Xiaohua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdura Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Sales Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leona LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Cugia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCG Collection Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?