November 18, 2013 |
Filing
2036
REDACATED ORDER re 1915 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Dr. Matthew Lynde from Testifying as to Certain Opinions in his Export Report [REDACTED] filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 1910 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Plaintiff's Damages Experts' Opinions (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/24/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
2026
ORDER,granting re 2025 Letter filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. Extension of time granted to 11/8/13. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
2024
ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUESTED REDACTIONS OF COURT'S ORDER RE DAUBERT MOTIONS AND DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 22, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing
2023
ORDER, granting re 2022 Letter filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation for extension of time to 10/25/13 to update Court on mediation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/15/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
2005
ORDER to file Docket No. 2004 (Order re Daubert Motions and Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion) under seal. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 24, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
|
June 27, 2013 |
Filing
1906
ORDER. signed 6/27/13, by Judge Joseph C.Spero denying without prejudice 1898 Defendants' Motion To Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Copying of Unpatented Features or Processes. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
1903
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MOTION TO PRECLUDE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 20, 2013 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
1889
ORDER RE 1772 VOLTERRA'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM OFFERING EVIDENCE REGARDING THE SECOND PRONG OF THE SEAGATE TEST RE WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 3, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
|
November 27, 2012 |
Filing
1848
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 1826 Motion for leave to submit revised opening expert reports (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
|
August 1, 2012 |
Filing
1811
ORDER TO FILE MOTIONS AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motions due by 10/19/2012. Responses due by 11/2/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
|
May 9, 2012 |
Filing
1767
PLEASE DISREGARD. POSTED IN ERROR. SEE DOCKET NO. 1765 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FURTHER SUPPLEMENTATION OF INTERROGATORY RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/8/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
1766
Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Re: 1734 & 1746 Discovery Letter Brief.(jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
|
April 3, 2012 |
Filing
1732
ORDER STRIKING INTERVENING RIGHTS DEFENSE FROM DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 3, 2012 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012).
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
1731
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO FILE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION 1727 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 27, 2012 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
|
March 1, 2012 |
Filing
1725
FURTHER STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/29/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
1707
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/31/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
1690
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS AND FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON THAT MOTION. 1669 MOTION to Amend/Correct 92 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, (Motion for Leave to Amend to Dismiss without Prejudice Defendants' Counterclaims) re-set for 2/17/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
|
December 6, 2011 |
Filing
1668
STIPULATION AND ORDER MOVING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 12/22/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing re-set for 12/22/2011 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/6/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
1655
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE AND OFR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON THAT MOTION. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. Motion Hearing Reset for 12/9/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/9/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
1644
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 1624 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Lawand for a New Trial (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
|
June 30, 2011 |
Filing
1626
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 1571 & 1589 Plaintiff's Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Obviousness; denying 1581 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Obviousness (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011).
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
1616
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING POST TRIAL BRIEFING. Dfts' Post-trial Motions (Rules 50 and 59 and For Certification of Judgment) due by 6/24/2011. Opposition due 8/1/11 to Post trial motions; Opposition due8/3/11 to Certification Motion; Reply due 8/12/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/811. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
1604
ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/24/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
1594
Court's Revised Proposed Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 23, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
|
May 19, 2011 |
Filing
1568
Court's Proposed Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 19, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
1535
COURT'S REVISED PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 9, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
1532
FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/9/2011. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
1524
Court's Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 6, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
1518
ORDER PERMITTING DELIVERY AND USE OF EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM D, 15TH FLOOR FOR THE DURATION OF TRIAL BEGINNING MAY 9, 2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/4/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
1504
ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH DAILY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/4/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
1498
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES AND PROPOSED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/3/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
|
April 21, 2011 |
Filing
1488
ORDER GRANTING re 1487 Brief, filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor Corporation re: Extension of time to Submit Joint Trial Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
|
April 19, 2011 |
Filing
1486
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FILING OF DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/19/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
|
April 7, 2011 |
Filing
1479
ORDER APPROVING JOINT PROPOSED CONFIDENTIAL JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE [docket no 1453]. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/7/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
1463
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 1236 Motion for Leave of Court to Submit Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Richard B. Fair, Ph.D. (jcslc1, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
|
April 1, 2011 |
Filing
1341
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FILING OF THE PARTIES' JOINT EXHIBIT LIST AND SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBIT BINDERS. File joint exhibit list on 4/1/11; final submission of joint exhibit list due 4/20/11; submission of exhibit binders to Court by 4/26/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/1/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
|
March 29, 2011 |
Filing
1333
ORDER to File Under Seal Court's March 29, 2011 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/29/11. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
1322
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXCHANGE OF PRETRIAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/08/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
1292
ORDER FOR BRIEFING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OF DOPED REGION re [1268 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Claim Construct ion of "Doped Region" filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc. Opposition due by 2/28/2011. No reply brief. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/18/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
|
November 16, 2010 |
Filing
1205
ORDER GRANTING re 1204 Letter filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc. to remove docket 1056-3 from the public docket and refiled Under Seal. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/16/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
|
November 5, 2010 |
Filing
1202
ORDER VACATING JANUARY 31, 2011 TRIAL DATE AND SETTING NEW SCHEDULE FOR CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 5, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
|
October 15, 2010 |
Filing
1182
ORDER FOR BRIEFS IN RESPONSE TO VOLTERRA OBJECTIONS IN DOCKET NUMBERS 1154 AND 1177. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 15, 2010 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010).
|
October 4, 2010 |
Filing
1176
PARTIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INFRINGMENT OF CLAIMS 26 AND 34 OF THE U.S. PATENT NO.6,278,264 AND CLAIMS 22 AND 24 OF THE U.S. PATENT No. 6,462,522. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/4/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
|
August 20, 2010 |
Filing
905
STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Schedule for Volterra's Motion to Quash. Motion hearing set for 9/10/10 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
|
August 9, 2010 |
Filing
895
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INFRINGMENT OF CLAIMS 9, 11, 16, 17, 18 AND 19 OF THE U.S. PATENT NO. 6,462,522. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/9/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
887
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS PRODUCED IN LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/21/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
849
ORDER Extending Time To File Join Letters re 848 Letter, filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/7/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
|
June 30, 2010 |
Filing
844
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/29/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing
833
ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIM TERM "FABRICATED ON A SURFACE OF THE SUBSTRATE". Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 9, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing
800
ORDER Re MAY 7, 2010 Hearing Transcript. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 7, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
|
April 30, 2010 |
Filing
794
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COURT CONSTRUE THE CLAIM TERM "FABRICATED ON A SURFACE OF THE SUBSTRATE". Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/30/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
788
ORDER AND PARTIAL JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGMENT OF U.S.PATENT NO. 6,713,823 PURSUANT TO FRCP 54(b). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/28/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing
768
AMENDED ORDER STRIKING ALL DISCOVERY LETTERS 752 Redacted Document, filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 754 Letter filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc., 753 Exhibits, filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 756 Letter Brief filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
|
April 8, 2010 |
Filing
760
ORDER Re Proposed Redactions to Hearing Transcripts of September 30, 2009, October 26, 2009, December 18, 2009, January 22, 2010 and January 27, 2010 and Court's November 17, 2009 Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 8, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
758
ORDER STRIKING ALL DISCOVERY LETTERS re 752 Redacted Document, filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, 754 Letter filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, Primarion, Inc., 756 Letter Brief filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation AND ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/7/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
|
March 23, 2010 |
Filing
745
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING ON DFTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Redacted Docket 665/ 712 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Opposition due by 4/2/2010. Replies due by 4/23/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/23/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing
707
ORDER GRANTIN re 706 Letter filed by Primarion, Inc., Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation for Vanessa Lafort to present oral argument on 3/5/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/5/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
699
Order to Submit Proposed Schedule. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 22, 2010. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
|
January 27, 2010 |
Filing
680
ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL TRANSCRIPT OF JANUARY 27, 2010 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
669
ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL TRANSCRIPT OF JANUARY 22, 2010 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
|
January 21, 2010 |
Filing
648
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINES FOR BRIEFING ON THE PARTIES' MOTIONS RELATED TO VOLTERRA'S SUBPOENA OF DR. RICHARD FAIR. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/21/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing
608
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FILING DATES REGARDING DFTS' OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLA'S NEW CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS AND EVIDENCE IN PLA'S REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PAPERS. Opp due 12/31/9, reply due 1/6/10.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
|
November 17, 2009 |
Filing
568
ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL COURTS NOVEMBER 17, 2009 ORDER re: [docket no. 566] Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
|
October 19, 2009 |
Filing
492
ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 451 Motion for Leave to Amend Patent L.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing
412
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/7/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing
312
ORDER ON DISCOVERY RE 186 Sealed Joint Letter REgarding Unresolved Discovery Dispute filed by Primarion, Inc., Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation, and 182 Redacted Joint Letter Regarding Unresolved Discovery Dispute filed by Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 08/24/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
|
August 13, 2009 |
Filing
208
ORDER Granting re 196 Admin Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Volterra's Motion for Prelim. Injunction and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Primarion, Inc., Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/12/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing
195
SEALING ORDER - To Seal Exhibit T to the combined declaration of Jeffrey M. Fisher in support of Volterra's Motion for Summary Judgment and Prelim. Injunction. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/12/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
August 5, 2009 |
Filing
191
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 184 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO EXTEND OTHER RELATED DATES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-3 (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
|
July 15, 2009 |
Filing
180
ORDER ON DISCOVERY re 96 Joint Letter filed by Primarion, Inc., Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/15/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
84
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 12, 2009. Case Management Conference prev. set for 05/29/09 at 1:30 PM has been continued to 6/12/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/26/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
|
May 20, 2009 |
Filing
82
ORDER DENYING re 81 Letter to Reschedule Deposition filed by Primarion, Inc., Infineon Technologies, AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corporation. ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER BY MAY 21, 2009, AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2009 at 01:30 PM.Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/20/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
|
April 16, 2009 |
Filing
71
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 25 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 28 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 36 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 39 Motion to Expedite. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing
69
ORDER to file under seal(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
|
March 27, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 41 Motion to Shorten Time. All pending motions will be heard on April 24, 2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
|
February 26, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER re 19 Stipulation filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation, Case referred to Private ADR. Deadlin to hold private mediation is no later than 9/1/2009. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
|
January 7, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER Granting re 14 Stipulation Extending Time for Volterra Semiconductor Corp. To Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims of Primarion, Inc. and Infineon Technologies North America Corp., filed by Volterra Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/7/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
|