Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Davis Moreno Construction Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Davis Moreno Construction Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv05138
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING CMC re 21 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Bo ard of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/13/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/11/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/1/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/10/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 11 Proposed Order, filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/13/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Davis Moreno Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Moreno Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?