Mixt Greens v. Sprout Cafe
Plaintiff: Mixt Greens
Defendant: Sprout Cafe
Case Number: 3:2008cv05175
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 115 Stipulation filed by Mixt Greens. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 115 Stipulation filed by Mixt Greens. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting cmc re 113 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND CMC ORDER re 95 Stipulation filed by Mixt Greens. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/21/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff Mixt Greens is required to E-FILE the amended document within a week of the date of this order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 67 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt and Sanctions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATES FOR COMPLETION OF DISCOVERY re 69 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/11/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY re 56 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending dates for completion of discovery re 39 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Substitution of Counsel filed by Mixt Greens. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 Stipulation filed by Sprout Cafe. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mixt Greens v. Sprout Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mixt Greens
Represented By: Gary Joel Nemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprout Cafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?