Harris v. Vector Marketing Corporation

Plaintiff: Alicia Harris
Defendant: Vector Marketing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv05198
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #519 Motion to Relate Case; granting #520 Motion to Relate Case (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 520 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Administrtive Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 519 MOTION to Relate Case (Defendant's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Kubin, Karen) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 6, 2012 Filing 518 NOTICE by Alicia Harris of Entry of Judgment and Notice of Order Granting Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Entry, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Entry, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service of Notice of Entry)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 6, 2012 Filing 517 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #505 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 27, 2012 Filing 515 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Peter Zaimes (Zaimes, John) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 27, 2012 Filing 514 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 1/27/2012) re #505 MOTION for Settlement filed by Alicia Harris. Motion is granted. Court to issue order (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 513 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 512 Brief re #505 MOTION for Settlement / Defendant's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Renewed Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #505 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 511 NOTICE by Vector Marketing Corporation Notice of Unavailability of Counsel (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER Re Second Supplemental Briefing for Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 29, 2011 Filing 509 Brief re #507 Order, #504 Order * Joint Supplemental Brief Re Plaintiffs Motion For Renewed Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #507 , #504 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 29, 2011 Filing 508 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Further Case Management Conference reset from 1/6/2012 to 1/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for #505 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 506 Statement of Non-Opposition re #505 Renotice motion hearing,, / Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Statement of No Position to Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #505 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 505 MOTION FOR SETTLEMENTRenewed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement filed byAlicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #2 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, #3 Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 12/22/2011) Modified on 12/27/2011 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER denying #503 Joint Stipulation for Shortened Time. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 503 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Re Shortened Notice on Plaintiff's Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; [Proposed] Order by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 502 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 12/5/11 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement reached in principle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 501 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE OF PARTIES AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 500 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re: Attendance of Parties at Settlement Conference by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 497 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Vector Marketing Corporation Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process (Lien, John) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 496 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Parties are encouraged to contact this Court if other means of ADR is desired, including a settlement conference before a magistrate judge. Further Case Management Conference is set for 1/6/12 at 11:30 a.m. Court will schedule summary judgment hearing if settlement is not reached by then. An updated joint CMC statement shall be filed by 12/30/11. (Date Filed: 10/28/2011). () (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER Denying #476 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Award of Costs; Denying as Moot #470 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and #477 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Award of Class Representative's Incentive Payment. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 494 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 9/23/2011) re #470 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alicia Harris. Court took matter under submission and will issue order.(Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 493 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #492 Brief RE Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #492 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 492 Brief Re: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 491 Brief Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Final Approval of Attorney Fees and Costs filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 490 CORRECTED ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for #470 , #476 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval and Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #470 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #476 MOTION For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs. Supplemental brief by 9/9/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for #470 , #477 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval and Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Supplemental briefs shall be filed by September 9, 2011. A further hearing on the motions shall be held on September 23, 2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/2011. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 488 Brief Plaintiff's 3rd Supplemental Brief In Support Of Motion for Final Approval filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 487 Brief Plaintiff's 2nd Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion for Final Approval filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 486 Brief SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 485 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 10, 2011, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 484 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/10/2011) re #470 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alicia Harris, #477 MOTION For Final Approval Of Award Of Class Representatives Incentive Payment filed by Alicia Harris, #476 MOTION For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs filed by Alicia Harris. Court to issue order (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 483 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 482 Proposed Order re #476 MOTION For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Award of Attorney Fees, Costs, and Incentive to Class Representative by Alicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 481 REPLY (re #470 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) In Support of Attorney's Fees filed byAlicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 480 Joinder re #476 MOTION Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 479 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #480 . *** Joinder re #476 MOTION Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2011 Filing 478 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of #477 MOTION For Final Approval Of Award Of Class Representatives Incentive Payment, #476 MOTION Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A To Declaration Of Stanley D. Saltzman, #2 Exhibit B To Declaration Of Stanley D. Saltzman)(Related document(s) #477 , #476 ) (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 477 MOTION For Final Approval Of Award Of Class Representatives Incentive Payment filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/3/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Alicia Harris In Support Of Motion For Award Of Class Representatives Incentive Payment)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 476 MOTION For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Costs filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/3/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #2 Declaration of Sherry Jung, #3 Declaration of Rachel Braun-Wnorowski, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement And For Award Of Attorney Fees, Costs, And Incentive To Class Representative)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 475 Letter dated 617/11 from Monica Trejo requesting to be excluded from settlement. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 474 Letter dated 5/27/11 from Miranda Logan re disagreement with terms of the settlement. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 473 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Harris of Standing Orders (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 472 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 471 ERRATA re #470 MOTION for Attorney Fees Declaration of Sherry Jung in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Alicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 470 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Sherry Jung in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sherry Jung, #8 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 469 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT APPROVAL SCHEDULE re #467 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 468 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Vector Marketing Corporation. Filed byAlicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 467 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Class Action Settlement Approval Schedule by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #450 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; And Granting Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 465 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/20/2011, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 464 Minute Entry: further Motion Hearing held on 4/20/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 4/21/2011) re #450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Alicia Harris. Court to issue order (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 463 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement * Declaration Of Roxanne M. Wilson In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement (Doc No. 450) * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #450 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 462 REPLY (re #450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement ) * Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Supplemental Brief Re: Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement (Doc No. 450) * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 461 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 460 Declaration of Michael O'Connor in Support of Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 459 Declaration of Marcus J. Bradley in Support of Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 458 Brief Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (Docket #450)DUE ON 4/13/11. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 9, 2011 Filing 455 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 8, 2011, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine A. Triska, CSR 12826, Telephone number 650-743-8425; christinetriska@sbcglobal.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2011. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 456 AMENDED Minute Entry: Hearing held on 4/8/2011 before Edward M. Chen re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement #450 . (Court Reporter Christine Triska) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2011).
April 8, 2011 Filing 454 ** PLEASE SEE DOCKET 456 ** Minute Entry: Hearing held on 4/8/2011. Modified on 4/11/2011 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 Filing 453 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Statement by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 452 NOTICE by Alicia Harris re #450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Notice of Filing Counterpart Signatures to Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release (Exhibit A to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval) (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 451 STIPULATION re #450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement to Conditionally Amend Complaint for Settlement Purposes by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 450 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 449 CLERKS NOTICE Motions due by 3/29/2011. Status Report due by 4/4/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. Status Conference set for 4/8/2011 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 448 Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference re class notice held. (Date Filed: 3/29/2011). (Recording #2:14-2:28.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 447 Letter from John Zaimes and Stanley Saltzman. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 446 CLERKS NOTICE Status Report due by 4/6/2011. Status Conference set for 4/13/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. 6/6/11 jury trial and trial related deadlines are vacated (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 445 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion JOINT NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NOS. 416, 418) (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 444 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #442 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #442 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 443 Declaration of Jill S. Attaway in Support of #442 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #442 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 442 REPLY (re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* ) filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 441 Declaration of Jill S. Attaway in Support of #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #416 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 440 REPLY (re #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues ) filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Craig Arnoff in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Adjudication)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 439 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to File Under Seal (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 438 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to File Under Seal (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 437 Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Vector's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Susan A. Joseph)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 436 RESPONSE (re #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues ) * Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Of John H. Lien With Exhibit A In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - E to Declaration Of John H. Lien With Ex A In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 435 RESPONSE (re #416 MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* ) Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig Arnoff)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 434 OBJECTIONS to Defendant Vector's Training Leader Declarations in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 433 OBJECTIONS to Declarations of Cohen and Devine Submitted by Defendant Vector in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 432 OBJECTIONS to Declarations of Hassay and Downey Submitted by Defendant Vector in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 431 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Jill Attaway Submitted by Defendant Vector in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 430 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Ali Saad Submitted by Defendant Vector in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 429 AMENDED ORDER RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE (opps. due 2/24/11 by 4p) re #427 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 22, 2011 Filing 428 FILED IN ERROR - See #429
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 427 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DEPOSITION OF ARNOFF AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JDUGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #425 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 426 Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humprey in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 425 STIPULATION * Joint Stipulation Re: Deposition Of Craig Arnoff And Motion For Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule; [Proposed] Order * by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 424 ERRATA re #421 Notice (Other) Re Manual Filing Notifications by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 423 NOTICE by Alicia Harris re #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues Notice of Manual Filing - LIT Training Items (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 422 NOTICE by Alicia Harris re #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues Notice of Manual Filing - Admin Manual Personal Recruiting Program (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 421 NOTICE by Alicia Harris re #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues Notice of Manual Filing Bates Number Vector3214 (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 420 Declaration of Susan Joseph in Support of #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues filed byAlicia Harris. (Related document(s) #418 ) (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 419 Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of #418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #2 Exhibit 5-7 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit 8, Part 1 of 2, to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Exhibit 8, Part 2 of 2, to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #5 Exhibit 9, Part 1 of 2, to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #6 Exhibit 9, Part 2 of 2, to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #7 Exhibit 10-11 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #8 Exhibit 12-15 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey)(Related document(s) #418 ) (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 418 MOTION for Summary Judgment , or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication of Causes of Action and/or Issues filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Craig Arnoff in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Craig Arnoff, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Craig Arnoff, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Craig Arnoff, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Craig Arnoff, #6 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 417 NOTICE by Alicia Harris Manual Filing - Confidential Deposition Testimony Excerpts - Paul Matheson (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 416 MOTION for Summary Judgment *Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof* filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Part 1 of Evidence In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Of Certified Class Claims, #2 Affidavit Part 2 of Evidence In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Of Certified Class Claims, #3 Affidavit Part 3 of Evidence In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Of Certified Class Claims, #4 Affidavit Part 4 of Evidence In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Of Certified Class Claims, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment Of Certified Class Claims)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 9, 2011 Filing 415 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER Granting #413 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Completion of Mailing of Class Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 413 STIPULATION Extending Deadline for Completion of Mailing of Class Notice by Alicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 Filing 412 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/02/11, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2011. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 411 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 2/4/2011) re #397 Defendant's Motion to Stay Action filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Defendant's motion is denied as stated on the record. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #393 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, #394 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel PMK Deposition, and #395 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 409 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 2/2/2011) re #397 Ex Parte Application RE: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Defendant's motion is denied. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 408 ERRATA re #405 Reply to Response to Motion by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 407 Reply Memorandum Supplemental Brief in Support of (1) #393 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories, Set Three, (2) #394 Motion to Compel PMK Deposition, (3) #395 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, Set Nine filed by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 Filing 406 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION BRIEF of Defendant Vector Marketing With Respect to Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Motions to Compel (Doc Nos. #392 , #393 , #394 ) filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Lien, John) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 Filing 405 REPLY in Support re #397 MOTION to Stay filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/2/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Filing 404 Request for Judicial Notice re #403 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed byAlicia Harris. (Related document(s) #403 ) (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 403 Memorandum in Opposition to #397 Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2011 Filing 402 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 28, 2011, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 401 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2011 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 1/28/2011) re #395 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production, Set Nine filed by Alicia Harris, #393 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Set Three filed by Alicia Harris, #394 MOTION to Compel PMK Deposition filed by Alicia Harris. Supplemental briefs due 2/1/11. Court to issue order thereafter (Recording #10:03-10:40.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION AND ORDER SPECIAL SETTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING NINTH CIRCUIT RESOLUTION OF RULE 23(F) PETITION re #399 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 399 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Re Shortened Notice on Vector's Motion to Stay Action Pending Ninth Circuit Resolution of Rule 23(f) Petition; [Proposed] Order by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 398 See #398 Stipulation and Ooder - Proposed Order re #397 Ex Parte Application RE: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 397 Ex Parte Application RE: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lien, John) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 396 Memorandum in Opposition re #395 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production, Set Nine, #393 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Set Three, #394 MOTION to Compel PMK Deposition filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Of Roxanne M. Wilson In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Opposition To Plaintiff Alicia Harris Motions To Compel Responses To Interrogatories (Set Three), Responses To Request For Production (Set Nine), And Person Most Knowledgeable Deposition)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 395 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production, Set Nine filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production Set Nine)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 394 MOTION to Compel PMK Deposition filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel PMK Deposition)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 393 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Set Three filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Motions to Compel, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit E-H to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plainitff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories Set Three)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING MOTION HEARING FOR 1/28/11 re #391 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 391 STIPULATION Re Plaintiff's Motions to Compel and Proposed Order by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING RULE 23 NOTICE AND OPT-OUT DEADLINES re #388 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 389 NOTICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #387 Ex Parte Application Re: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application Re: Shortened Notice and Motionto Stay Action (Docket No. 387) (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 5, 2011 Filing 388 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Re Continuance of Rule 23 Notice and Opt-Out Deadlines; [Proposed] Order by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 387 Ex Parte Application Re: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Motion To Stay, #2 Exhibit B Decl (Part 1), #3 Exhibit B Decl (Part 2), #4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Ex Parte Re: Shortened Notice on Motion to Stay Action)(Lien, John) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 386 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUANCE OF RULE 23 NOTICE AND OPT-OUT DEADLINES, ETC. re #385 Stipulation, filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 8, 2010 Filing 385 STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re 30-Day Continuance Of Rule 23 Notice And Opt-Out Deadline And Two Week Continuance Of Expert Designation And Discovery Deadlines by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER Re #382 Joint Letter of December 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 383 ERRATA re #382 Letter Brief Re Disputed Wording Rule 23 Class Notice by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 382 Letter Brief re Disputed Wording Rule 23 Class Notice filed byAlicia Harris, Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30-day continuance of Rule 23 notice and opt-out deadline re #380 filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/12/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 380 STIPULATION - Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re 30-Day Continuance Of Rule 23 Notice And Opt-Out Deadline filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 379 Minute Entry: Telephonic Motion Hearing (#376) held on 11/10/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 11/10/2010) re #376 Ex Parte Application filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Parties to submit proposed stipulation to court by end of today (Recording #1:39-1:53.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2010)
November 10, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 378 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's #376 Ex Parte Application to Stay filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Ex Parte Application and Denying Defendant's Motion to Stay)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 11/9/2010) Modified on 11/10/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 Filing 377 CLERKS NOTICE re defendant's ex parte application to stay or continue (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 376 Ex Parte Application filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration Of Roxanne M. Wilson In Support Of Vector Marketing Corporations Ex Parte Application To Stay, Or, In The Alternative, Continue Class Notice And Opt-Out Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Ex Parte Application To Stay, Or, In The Alternative, Continue Class Notice And Opt-Out Deadlines)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #332 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify FLSA Collective Action; Denying #330 Defendant's Cross-Motion to Decertify Class; Granting in Part and Denying in Part #337 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Rule 23 Class Action; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #336 Defendant's Cross-Motion to Deny Certification. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 374 OBJECTIONS to re #373 Brief, to Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motions to Decertify FLSA Collective Action and Rule 23 Claims by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 373 Brief re #336 MOTION to Deny Certification Of Rule 23 Class Supplemental Brief in Support of Motions to Decertify FLSA Collective Action and Rule 23 Claims filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #336 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 372 Brief re #337 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 Supplemental Brief filed byAlicia Harris. (Related document(s) #337 ) (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 371 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 27, 2010, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler25@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2011. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 370 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 10/27/2010) re #330 MOTION to to Deny Certification of Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Class filed by Vector Marketing Corporation, #337 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 filed by Alicia Harris, #336 MOTION to Deny Certification Of Rule 23 Class filed by Vector Marketing Corporation, #332 MOTION For Final Collective Class Action Certification filed by Alicia Harris. Parties shall submit short briefs by 10/29/10. Court to issue order thereafter (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 369 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 368 ERRATA re #352 Memorandum in Opposition, Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's (1) Motion to Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action, and (2) Motion to Deny Certification of Rule 23 Class by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 to Notice of Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 367 ERRATA re #352 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion to Deny Certification of Rule 23 Class by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 366 ERRATA re #347 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Defendant's Motion to Deny Certification of Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Class by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 365 ERRATA re #337 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 and (332) Motion for Final Collective Class Action Certification by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25 to Notice of Second Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #2 Exhibit 27 to Notice of Second Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit 32 to Notice of Second Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Exhibit 35 to Notice of Second Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #5 Exhibit 36 to Notice of Second Errata Re Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 364 ERRATA re #332 MOTION For Final Collective Class Action Certification by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 363 ERRATA re #337 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 362 OBJECTIONS to re #336 MOTION to Deny Certification Of Rule 23 Class Evedentiary Objections of Vector Marketing Corp. to Declaration of Philip C. Gorman In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's (1) Motion to Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action, and (2) Motion to Deny Certification of Rule 23 Class by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 361 Declaration of Christina Humphrey in Support of Reply to Opposition to Motion For Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP 23 filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 360 Reply to Opposition to #337 Motion For Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP 23 filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/18/2010) Modified on 10/19/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2010 Filing 359 Reply to Opposition re #332 MOTION For Final Collective Class Action Certification filed byAlicia Harris. (Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 CORRECTED ORDER re #357 Order on Motion for Leave to File short replies. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #354 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Short Replies (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 14, 2010 Filing 356 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's #354 Motion for Leave to File Short Replies Re Class Certification Motions filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Short Replies Re Class Certification Motions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/14/2010) Modified on 10/15/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2010 Filing 355 Proposed Order re #354 MOTION for Leave to File Short Replies RE Class Certification Motions by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 354 MOTION for Leave to File Short Replies RE Class Certification Motions filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 353 OBJECTIONS to re #347 Memorandum in Opposition, Evidentiary Objections to Sales Representative Declarations Submittted by Vector in Support of its Motions to Deny Certification by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objections - Vol. 2 of 2)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 352 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Deny Certification of Rule 23 Class filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motions to Deny Certification, #2 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit 6-10 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Exhibit 11-18 to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 Filing 351 DECLARATION of Paul Matheson in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Class Certification/Final Collective Action Certification filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 350 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #346 Memorandum in Opposition, #349 Memorandum in Opposition filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 4, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 4, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 4, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of 4)(Related document(s) #346 , #349 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 349 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's #337 Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 23 filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/6/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Filing 348 OBJECTIONS to re #347 Memorandum in Opposition, Evidentiary Objections to Deposition of Ali Saad by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Filing 347 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's #330 Motion to Deny Certification of Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Class filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Philip C. Gorman in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Deny Certification, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Shapiro in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Deny Certification)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 10/6/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2010 Filing 346 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's #332 Motion for Final Collective Action Certification filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/6/2010) Modified on 10/7/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 Filing 345 ERRATA re #336 MOTION to Deny Certification Of Rule 23 Class, #335 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 344 ERRATA Re #337 Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Motions for Class Certification by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2010 Filing 343 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Exhibit 31 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #3 Exhibit 32 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #4 Exhibit 33 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #5 Exhibit 34 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #6 Exhibit 35 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 342 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26-Part 1 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Exhibit 26-Part 2 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #3 Exhibit 26-Part 3 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #4 Exhibit 27 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #5 Exhibit 28 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 341 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Exhibit 22 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #3 Exhibit 23 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #4 Exhibit 24 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #5 Exhibit 25 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 340 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Exhibit 17-Part 1 of Plaintiff's Motions, #3 Exhibit 17-Part 2 of Plaintiff's Motions, #4 Exhibit 18 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #5 Exhibit 19 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #6 Exhibit 20 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 339 Declaration of As Listed in Evidence Pleadings In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class in Support of #336 MOTION to Certify Class (Denial of Certification Of Rule 23 Class) MOTION to Certify Class (Denial of Certification Of Rule 23 Class) * Evidence In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #2 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #3 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #4 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #5 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 6 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #6 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 7 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #7 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 1 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #8 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #9 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #10 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #11 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #12 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 1 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #13 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #14 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #15 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #16 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #17 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 6 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified Flsa Collective Action And Rule 23 Class)(Related document(s) #336 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 338 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Exhibit 12 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #3 Exhibit 13 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #4 Exhibit 14 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #5 Exhibit 15 in Support of Plaintiff's Motion)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 337 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Motions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 336 MOTION to Deny Certification Of Rule 23 Class filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion To Decertify Rule 23 Class)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re #330 MOTION to Certify Class (Decertification - Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action) MOTION to Certify Class (Decertification - Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action) * Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action * filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 1 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #2 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #3 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #4 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #5 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #6 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 6 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #7 Affidavit Evidence Vol 1 Part 7 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #8 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 1 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #9 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #10 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #11 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #12 Affidavit Evidence Vol 2 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #13 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 1 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #14 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 2 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #15 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 3 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #16 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 4 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #17 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 5 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class, #18 Affidavit Evidence Vol 3 Part 6 In Support Of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motions To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action And Rule 23 Class)(Related document(s) #330 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 334 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #2 Exhibit 7 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #3 Exhibit 8 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #4 Exhibit 9 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #5 Exhibit 10 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 333 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of Exhibits in Support of (1) Motion Pursuant to FLSA Section 216(b), and (2) Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #2 Exhibit 2 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #3 Exhibit 3 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #4 Exhibit 4 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions, #5 Exhibit 5 in Support of Plaintiff'sMotions)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 332 MOTION For Final Collective Class Action Certification filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 331 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #335 . *** Brief re #330 MOTION to Certify Class (Decertification - Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action) MOTION to Certify Class (Decertification - Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action) Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Decertify Conditionally Certified FLSA Collective Action filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #330 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 330 MOTION to Deny Certification of Fair Labor Standards Act Collective Class filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporations Motion To Decertify Conditional Collective Fair Labor Standards Act Class)(Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 9/22/2010) Modified on 9/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Filing 329 AFFIDAVIT Compendium of declarations in support of (1) motion pursuant to FLSA section 216(b), and (2) motion for class certification pursuant to FRCP Rule 23 by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alicia Harris in support of plaintiff's motions, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Martin Shapiro, Ph.D. in support of plaintiff's motions, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley Saltzman in support of plaintiff's motions, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Larry W. Lee in support of plaintiff's motions, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Sherry Jung in support of plaintiff's motions)(Marlin, Louis) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 328 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/15/10, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #311 Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 326 ERRATA re #323 Reply Memorandum, #324 Reply Memorandum, #325 Reply Memorandum, Supplemental Brief Filed in Support of Motion for Intervention by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 325 SECOND CORRECTED Amended Supplemental Brief re #311 MOTION to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 Filing 324 CORRECTED Amended Supplemental Brief re #311 MOTION to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 Filing 323 Supplemental Brief in Support re #311 MOTION to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 Filing 322 Letter Brief filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 15, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Status Report due by 10/20/2010. Status Conference set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 321 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 9/15/2010) re #311 MOTION to Intervene. Cross briefs due 9/16/10. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 320 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alicia Harris, Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 319 Reply to Opposition re #311 MOTION to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Intervene)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 318 Declaration of John Lien in Support of #317 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff''s Motion to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Lien Declaration)(Related document(s) #317 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 317 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 31, 2010 Filing 316 ANSWER to Amended Complaint THIRD byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 315 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 25, 2010, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2010. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #295 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Class Cert. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Class Cert. Motions due by 9/22/2010.. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 8/26/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Status Report due by 9/8/2010. Status Conference set for 9/15/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 312 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/26/2010) re #295 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of a Rule 30(B)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Court will issue order. Deadlines relating to class certification motion(s) have been extended to two weeks. Further status conference is set for 9/15/10 at 3:00 p.m. Court will issue amended cmc order. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 311 MOTION to Intervene Hunter Bryan and Jentila Biddle as Additional Named Plaintiffs and Class Representatives filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jentila Biddle in Support of Motion to Intervene, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 310 OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Dr. Martin Shapiro in Suppot of Harris' Opposition ot Motion for Reconsideration by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 309 Reply Memorandum in Support of #295 Moton for Reconsideration re Designation of Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/23/2010) Modified on 8/24/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 Filing 308 Declaration of Martin Shapiro in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's #295 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 Filing 307 Declaration of Christina Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's #295 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 Filing 306 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's #295 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of Rule 30(b)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2010 Filing 305 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 17, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing (Motion to Intervene) set for 9/15/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #193 Motion to Strike #193 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]. Motion to intervene is set for 9/15/10 at 3:00 p.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #215 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE TO 8/25/10 re #294 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Status Report due by 8/18/2010. Status Conference set for 8/25/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing (Docket #295)set for 8/25/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #298 Motion to Shorten Time re Motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 300 Proposed Order re #295 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of a Rule 30(B)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales, #298 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time Re: Motion for Leave to Amend to File A Motion for Reconsideration by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 299 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #298 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time Re: Motion for Leave to Amend to File A Motion for Reconsideration filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #298 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 298 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time Re: Motion for Leave to Amend to File A Motion for Reconsideration filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 297 Declaration of Paul Matheson in Support of #295 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of a Rule 30(B)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #295 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 296 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #295 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of a Rule 30(B)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #295 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 295 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration Re: Designation of a Rule 30(B)(6) Witness on Average Total Sales filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2010 10:30 AM. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 294 STIPULATION and Proposed Order RE Continuance of Case Status Conferece [Joint] by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Re #292 Joint Letter of August 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/9/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 292 Letter from Vector Marketing Corporation Joint. (Attachments: #1 ExA to Letter Brief, #2 ExB to Letter Brief)(Lien, John) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 291 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alicia Harris, Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 290 Reply to Opposition re #215 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byAlicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 289 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 59 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 288 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 58 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 287 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 57 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 286 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 56 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 285 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 55 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 284 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 54 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 283 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 53 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 282 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 52 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 281 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 51 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 280 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 50 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 279 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 49 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 278 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 48 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 277 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 47 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 276 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 46 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 275 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 45 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 274 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 44 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 273 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 43 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 272 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 42 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 271 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 41 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 270 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 40 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 269 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 39 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 268 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 38 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 267 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 37 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 266 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 36 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 265 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 35 of 59 (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 264 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 34 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 263 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 33 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 262 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 32 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 261 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 31 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 260 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 30 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 259 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 29 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 258 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 28 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 257 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 27 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 256 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 26 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 255 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 25 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 254 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 24 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 253 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 23 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 252 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 22 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 251 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 21 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 250 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 20 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 249 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 19 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 248 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 18 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 247 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 17 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 246 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 16 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 245 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 15 of 59.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 244 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 14 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 243 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 13 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 242 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 12 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 241 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 11 of 59.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 240 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 10 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 239 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 9 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 238 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 8 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 237 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 7 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 236 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 6 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 235 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 5 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 234 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 4 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 233 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 3 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 232 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 2 of 59.(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 231 CONSENT TO JOIN FORMS filed by Alicia Harris re #229 Notice; Volume 1 of 59. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 230 AFFIDAVIT of Rachel Wnorowski Re Notice Mailing and Consent to Join Form Processing by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Rachel Wnorowski, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 1 of 2, to Declaration of Rachel Wnorowski, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 2 of 2, to Declaration of Rachel Wnorowski)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 229 NOTICE by Alicia Harris Filing Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms, #4 Exhibit B, Part 1 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms, #5 Exhibit B, Part 2 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms, #6 Exhibit B, Part 3 of 3, to Notice of Filing Consent to Join Forms)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Harris re #227 Notice (Other) Consent to Join Forms (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE by Alicia Harris Consent to Join Forms, Volumes 1 through 59, Manual Filing Notification (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 226 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #225 Memorandum in Opposition filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #225 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #215 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Denying #190 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition on Compensation of Sales Representatives. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 223 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to the Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 222 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #221 Reply Memorandum, filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #221 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 221 Reply Memorandum re #193 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #219 Declaration in Support, #218 Reply Memorandum (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 219 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #218 Reply Memorandum filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #218 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 218 Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing RE #190 Motion to Compel filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/27/2010) Modified on 7/28/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE JENNIFER SEPULVEDA re #216 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 25, 2010 Filing 216 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Re Jennifer Sepulveda by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 7/25/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 215 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 214 Declaration of Susan Joseph in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 213 Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 212 Brief Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Plaintiff's #190 Motion to Compel Defendant's 30(b)(6) Deposition filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #186 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash; granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part #190 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 210 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/21/2010, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 209 OBJECTIONS to re #208 Memorandum in Opposition,, Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 208 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's #193 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Larry W. Lee)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 Filing 207 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 7/21/2010) re #190 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by Alicia Harris, #186 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Alicia Harris. Plaintiffs motion to quash is granted in part and denied in part. Court to issue detailed order. Plaintiffs motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs supplemental brief shall be filed by 7/23/10. Defendant shall filed its response by 7/27/10. Court to issue detailed order thereafter. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2010)
July 20, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing (LD to hearing Dispositive Motion)set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 19, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing (Plaintiff's motion to quash Employment Records) set for 8/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STAY OF PRODUCTION OF PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYMENT RECORDS re #205 Stipulation, filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 205 STIPULATION Re Stay of Production of Plaintiff's Employment Records Pending Disposition of Plaintiff's Motions to Quash Subpoenas and Shortening Time on Said Motions and Proposed Order by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 204 Declaration Christina Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 203 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's #186 Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/7/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2010 Filing 202 Declaration of Christina Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 201 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's #190 Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/7/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2010 Filing 200 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #199 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #199 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 199 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #186 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 198 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson in Support of #197 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #197 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 197 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #190 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 196 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing reset for 8/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2010. Case Management Conference reset for 8/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #194 Declaration in Support, #193 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 194 Declaration of Roxanne M. Wilson In Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's #193 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint [F.R.C.P. 12 (f)] filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 193 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff Alicia Harris's Third Amended Complaint[F.R.C.P.12(f)]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING FRCP 30 LIMITATION ON NUMBER OF DEPOSITIONS, ETC. re #191 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 191 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending FRCP Limitation on Number of Depositions and FRCP 33 Limitation on Number of Interrogatories by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 190 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 30(b)(6) filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re #188 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris, Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 188 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Defendant's Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Alicia Harris, Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 187 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing (Docket 186) reset for 7/21/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 186 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christina A. Humphrey, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING OBLIGATION UNDER SUBPOENA PENDING DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH re #183 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 184 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Class Action Complaint against Vector Marketing Corporation. Filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 183 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Staying Obligation Under Subpoena Pending Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash by Alicia Harris. (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 182 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Marcus J. Bradley in Response to Order Re Class Notice by Alicia Harris. (Bradley, Marcus) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re [177, 178] Class Notice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/21/2010. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 180 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #114 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 178 Letter Brief Re Proposed Class Notice filed byAlicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 20, 2010 Filing 177 NOTICE by Alicia Harris Proposed Class Notice (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #132 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Form and Postcard) (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 175 Letter from Christina A. Humphrey regarding Proposed Notice of Conditional Certification. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Conditional Certification)(Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 174 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/12/10, before Judge Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler25@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2010. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 173 Letter Brief re #141 Memorandum in Opposition,, Supplemental Letter Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #132 Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 172 Letter Brief Supplemental Brief In Support of Plaintiff's #132 Motion for Conditional Class Certification filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 171 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/12/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 5/13/2010) re #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Alicia Harris, #114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Supplemental letter briefs due 5/17/10. Court will then take motions under submission (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 170 OBJECTIONS to Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(B) of the FLSA by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John H Lien (Lien, John) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Ann Humphrey (Humphrey, Christina) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 167 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 166 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of #165 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Related document(s) #165 ) (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 165 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's #132 Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed by Alicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/30/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re #162 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PHONE RECORDS re #161 Stipulation filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 162 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order and [Proposed] Order by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 161 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Phone Records by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #144 Declaration in Opposition, #141 Memorandum in Opposition,, #150 Declaration in Opposition,, #152 Declaration in Opposition,, #157 Declaration in Opposition,, #151 Declaration in Opposition,, #148 Declaration in Opposition,, #146 Declaration in Opposition, #154 Objection, #159 Declaration in Opposition,, #143 Declaration in Opposition, #156 Declaration in Opposition,, #142 Declaration in Opposition, #149 Declaration in Opposition,, #147 Declaration in Opposition,, #155 Declaration in Opposition,, #153 Declaration in Opposition,, #158 Declaration in Opposition,, #145 Declaration in Opposition (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 159 **Duplicate Entry - Please See Document #146 ** DECLARATION of Nick Conedera in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/29/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 158 **Duplicate Entry - Please See Document #145 ** DECLARATION of Paul Comstock in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 157 **Duplicate Entry - Please See Document #144 ** DECLARATION of Ryan Casey in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 156 **Duplicate Entry - Please See Document #143 ** DECLARATION of Brandon Brown in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 155 **Duplicate Entry - Please See Document #142 ** DECLARATION of Matt Boland in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 154 OBJECTIONS to re #137 Declaration in Support, #135 Declaration in Support, #134 Declaration in Support, #136 Declaration in Support by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 153 DECLARATION of Manilene Rodrigo in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 152 DECLARATION of Catalina Montesdeoca in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 151 DECLARATION of Paul Matheson in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 150 DECLARATION of Debi Lombardi in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 149 DECLARATION of Evan Keller in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Christine Hanks in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Karl Gedris in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Nick Conedera in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Paul Comstock in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Ryan Casey in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Brandon Brown in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 142 DECLARATION of Matt Boland in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 Filing 141 Memorandum in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Roxanne McClure Wilson (Wilson, Roxanne) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 139 Reply Memorandum In Support of its #114 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 4/21/2010) Modified on 4/22/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2010. Case Management Conference reset for 5/12/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 20, 2010 Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing (Docket #114) set for 5/12/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 137 Declaration of Tulane Seville in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 136 Declaration of Jian Davenport in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 135 Declaration of Hunter Bryan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 134 Declaration of Alicia Harris in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 133 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 132 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 131 Memorandum in Opposition to #114 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Affidavit)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend #121 #125 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 129 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend held. Court took matter under submission and will issue order (Date Filed: 4/2/2010). (Court Reporter Kelly Bryce.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 128 Brief Plaintiff's Statement Re Certification Discovery in Support of QSP Claim filed byAlicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Re Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2010 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 26, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/2/2011. Motions due by 4/14/2010. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/10. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Proposed Amendment Of Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 124 Declaration of Paul Matheson In Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Opposition to Proposed Amendment of Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 123 Declaration of John H. Lien In Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Opposition To Proposed Amendment of Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 122 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman in Support of #121 Brief Plaintiff's Points and Authorities Regarding Amendment to Complaint to Include Qualified Sales Presentations filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #121 ) (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 121 Brief Plaintiff's Points and Authorities Regarding Amendment to Complaint to Include Qualified Sales Presentations filed byAlicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 120 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/17/2010 before Edward M. Chen. Cross briefs shall be filed by 3/24/10. Further status conference is set for 5/5/10 at 10:30 a.m. An updated joint status conference statement shall be filed by 4/28/10. Court to issue amended case management conference order. (Date Filed: 3/19/2010). (Tape #2:42-3:14.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing (Docket #114) reset for 5/5/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 118 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Supplemental (redlined) filed by Alicia Harris. (Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 117 Declaration of Stanley D. Saltzman Under FRCP 16-9(a) filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Saltzman, Stanley) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 13, 2010 Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/13/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 115 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RESETTING TRIAL TO 6/6/11. CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2011. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 3, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery due by 1/3/2011. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING JURY TRIAL FROM 10/4/10 TO 5/23/11 re #111 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Filing 111 STIPULATION re: Selection of Trial Date by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Trial Date)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 110 Letter from Larry W. Lee re scheduling trial date. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #102 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 31, 2009 Filing 108 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/09, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 24, 2009 Filing 107 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-16-09, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/24/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 16, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2010. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 106 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2009 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 12/16/2009) re #102 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint filed by Alicia Harris. Court took matter under submission. Further Status set for 3/17/10 at 2:30 p.m. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 Filing 105 NOTICE by Alicia Harris Notice of Association of Counsel (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 104 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 102 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #3 Proposed Order)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #83 Defendant's Motion for Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal and for Stay of District Court Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Re Case Management Conference Statement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2009. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2009 before Edward M. Chen. Court took matter under submission (Date Filed: 11/16/2009), Further Case Management Conference held on 11/16/2009 before Edward M. Chen. Further Status set for 12/16/09 (Date Filed: 11/16/2009). (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 98 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 97 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/21/09, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #68 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 95 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing reset for 11/16/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference reset for 11/16/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #93 Reply to Response to Motion For Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal (Lien, John) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion For Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 92 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing reset for 11/16/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2009. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 91 CLERKS NOTICE, CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Case Management Conference reset for 11/18/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2009. Motion Hearing reset for 11/18/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal and for Stay of District Court Proceedings filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Larry W. Lee)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #72 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and Denying #73 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2009 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 10/22/2009) re #73 MOTION for Sanctions (denied) #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint (under submission), #72 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents filed by Alicia Harris (granted in part and denied in part.) (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #85 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Motion Hearing Dates. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 Filing 86 Memorandum in Opposition re #85 Ex Parte Application re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3, #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Ex Parte Application re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3, #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Ex Parte Application re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3, #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Ex Parte Application re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3, #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Motion Hearing Dates, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Larry W. Lee)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 85 Ex Parte Application re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3, #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint, #72 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Zaimes In Support of Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Motion Hearing Dates, #2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application to Consolidate Motion Hearing Dates)(Lien, John) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation Proof of Service (Lien, John) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 83 MOTION Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion for Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal (28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and for Stay of District Court Proceedings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Certification of Order Denying Summary Judgment for Interlocutory Appeal and for Stay of District Court Proceedings)(Lien, John) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 82 Reply to Opposition re #72 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Larry W. Lee)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 81 Reply to Opposition re #73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Larry W. Lee)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #75 Memorandum in Opposition, #74 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #77 Declaration in Support, #76 Declaration in Support, #78 Declaration in Support, Proof of Service (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 78 Declaration of Paul Matheson in Support of #74 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Declaration of Paul Matheson in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 77 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #75 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 76 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #74 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and For Sanctions filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 74 Opposition to MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2009 10:30 AM. (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/30/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (ga, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2009 Filing 73 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) and Civil Local Rule 37-3 filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 72 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #3 Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #35 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/4/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 1, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE by Vector Marketing Corporation Notice of Unabailability of Counsel (Lien, John) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 26, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 10/21/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 Filing 69 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2009 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/26/2009) re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Court took matter under submission. Defendants request to extend hearing on Plaintiffs motion for leave to file third amended complaint granted. Hearing reset from 9/30/09 to 10/21/09 at 10:30 a.m. Opposition shall be filed by 9/30/09. Reply shall be filed by 10/7/09. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 Filing 68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Amended Complaint filed by Alicia Harris. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Larry W. Lee, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #64 Reply Memorandum, #65 Objection, #66 Declaration in Support,, Proof of Service (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 66 Declaration of John H. Lien Supplemental Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] (Part 2))(Lien, John) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 65 OBJECTIONS to Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation to Plaintiff Alicia Harris' Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Objections of defendant Vector Marketing Corporation to Plaintiff Alicia Harris' Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Lien, John) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 64 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 63 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAlicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's MSJ, #2 Affidavit of Alicia Harris in Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's MSJ)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 6, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #58 First Ex Parte Application re Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Alicia Harris, #61 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 61 STIPULATION re #57 Clerks Notice re MSJ Briefing Schedule by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Defendant's MSJ Briefing Schedule)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 60 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte re Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 59 Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte re Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 58 First Ex Parte Application re Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 18, 2009 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE vacating 7/8/09 hearing (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Harris re #52 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #53 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #55 Declaration in Support, #54 Brief, #51 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 55 Declaration of Craig S. Hubble In Support of Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 54 Brief Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Declaration of Larry W. Lee in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Declaration of Alicia Harris in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed byAlicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #49 Declaration in Support,, #41 Declaration in Support,, #47 Declaration in Support,, #42 Declaration in Support,, #43 Declaration in Support,, #44 Declaration in Support,, #48 Declaration in Support,, #37 Declaration in Support,, #38 Declaration in Support,, #46 Declaration in Support,, #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #45 Declaration in Support,, #40 Declaration in Support,, #39 Declaration in Support,, #36 Proposed Order,, Proof of Service (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 49 Declaration of Paul Matheson in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Paul Matheson in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 48 Declaration of Joseph Mariano in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Joseph Mariano in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion ofr Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 47 Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of John H. Lien in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 46 Declaration of Matthew Lewis in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Matthew Lewis in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 45 Declaration of Rick Leahy in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaraton of Rick Leahy in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgement or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 44 Declaration of Todd Hedrick in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Todd Hedrick in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 43 Declaration of Derek N. Hassay in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Derek N. Hassay in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 42 Declaration of Jill S. Attaway, PH.D in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Jill S. Attaway, PH.D, in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 41 Declaration of W. Scott Downey, PH.D in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of W. Scott Downey, PH.D, in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 40 Declaration of Danzaldy Casanova in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Danzaldy Casanova in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 39 Declaration of Monica Carrasco in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Monica Carrasco in Support of Defendant Vector marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 38 Declaration of Mary Bartolini in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Mary Bartolini in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 37 Declaration of Jean-Paul Arlie in Support of #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Jean-Paul Arlie in Support of Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56] filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 36 Proposed Order re #35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Vector Marketing Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Claims by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication [F.R.C.P. 56]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2009 02:30 PM. (Lien, John) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
May 14, 2009 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. 15-day jury trial remains to begin on 10/4/2010 at 8:30 a.m. Parties informed court that FLSA class issue will be deferred, however, motion(s) for summary judgment will be filed by 6/3/2009. Hearing to be held on 7/8/2009 at 2:30 p.m. (Date Filed: 5/14/2009). (Tape #2:58-3:01.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2009)
May 6, 2009 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT UPDATED JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TOLLING AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 7, 2009 Filing 31 STIPULATION Re: Tolling Agreement by Alicia Harris. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Vector Marketing Corporation and Counsel (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Comlaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET #27 AND #28 byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 20, 2009 Filing 27 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #29 . *** ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended Comlaint byVector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 3/20/2009) Modified on 3/20/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE by Alicia Harris of Association of Counsel (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 25 AMENDED Minute Entry (Motion hearing changed from 7/1/09 to 7/8/09) Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/25/2009 before Edward M. Chen. (Date Filed: 2/26/2009). (Tape #1:40-1:59.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (Motion hearing changed from 7/1/09 to 7/8/09): Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2009. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2009 02:30 PM. Discovery due by 5/17/2010. Jury Trial set for 10/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 6/3/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 26, 2009 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/25/2009 before Edward M. Chen. 15-day jury trial set for 10/4/2010 at 8:30 a.m. This case is referred to private mediation to be completed by 5/6/2009. Case continued to: 5/13/2009 at 2:30 p.m. for Status Conference. An updated joint status conference statement shall be filed by 5/6/2009. (Date Filed: 2/26/2009). (Tape #1:40-1:59.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CORRECTED DOCKET ATTACHMENT FOR 15 and 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting appearance by phone re #19 Letter filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/25/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 19 Letter from John Lien. (Lien, John) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 18, 2009 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Vector Marketing Corporation. (Lien, John) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 17 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vector Marketing Corporation. Filed byAlicia Harris. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (SEE DOCKET 21) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009) Modified on 2/25/2009 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #12 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Alicia Harris (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 6, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION to File Second Amended Complaint by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 29, 2009 Filing 11 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alicia Harris.. (Lee, Larry) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 21, 2009 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vector Marketing Corporation.. (Lien, John) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Alicia Harris. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/31/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 8 Answer to Amended Complaint #7 Amended Complaint byVector Marketing Corporation. (Yu, Jordan) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vector Marketing Corporation. Filed byAlicia Harris. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 6 STIPULATION to File First Amended Complaint by Alicia Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Lee, Larry) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vector Marketing Corporation re #3 Notice (Other), #4 ADR Scheduling Order, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2009. Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/08. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Vector Marketing Corporation (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vector Marketing Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Alcas Corp, Other Affiliate Cutco Corporation, Other Affiliate Cutco Cutlery Corporation, Other Affiliate Cutco International Inc., Other Affiliate Kabor Knives Inc. for Vector Marketing Corporation. re #1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 17, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL / no process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is cgc 08- 480874. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611025613). Filed byVector Marketing Corporation. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2012: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slh, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Vector Marketing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Harris
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Craig Steven Hubble
Represented By: Daniel Hyo-Shik Chang
Represented By: Sherry Jung,
Represented By: Christina Ann Humphrey
Represented By: Louis Michael Marlin
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector Marketing Corporation
Represented By: Karen Joyce Kubin
Represented By: Jordan Seungjin Yu
Represented By: Roxanne McClure Wilson
Represented By: John H Lien
Represented By: John Peter Zaimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?