Jackson v. Curry et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Jackson
Defendant: Ben Curry and M. Lawrence
Case Number: 3:2008cv05207
Filed: November 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion continued to 9/6/13, at 9 a.m.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/9/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER requiring status report. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 29, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. 57 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE VADAS re 59 Stipulation filed by M. Lawrence. The Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation with respect to vacating the Settlement Conference before Judge Vadas. The parties sha ll proceed with the Conference as ordered by Judge Vadas. It is not appropriate for this Court to vacate a calendar before another Judge. To the extent Defendant wish to file a Motion for Reconsideration, Defendant may do so independent of the Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Vadas on 1/27/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re 52 Stipulation filed by Bernard Jackson, Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2011 09:00 AM. at Solano State Prison. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/26/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for plaintiff's appearance at Solano State Prison February 2, 2011 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/27/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport Plaintiff for July 6, 2010 settlement conference at Solano State Prison issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/8/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?