Fortinet, Inc. v. Trend Micro Incorporated
Plaintiff: Fortinet, Inc.
Defendant: Trend Micro Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2008cv05371
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Patent Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RELATED CASE ORDER. Fortinet, Inc. v. Trend Micro Incorporated, Case No. 08-5371 MMC, is related to Fortinet, Inc. v. Trend Micro Incorporated, et al., Case No. 10-0048 EDL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: 1. Trend Micros motion to dismiss the First and Second Causes of Action is hereby GRANTED, and the First and Second Causes of Action are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.2. Trend Micros Counterclaim is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING TREND MICRO INCORPORATED'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (1) PORTIONS OF REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) PORTIONS OF STEPHEN QUANE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL CERTAIN DOCUMENTS RELATED TO RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ANSWER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES. The initial Case Management Conference will be conducted on June 12, 2009, at 10:30 a.m., Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the Third and Fourth Causes of Action, the motion is granted, and the Third and Fourth Causes of Action are dismissed without leave to amend. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER VACATING APRIL 3, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009) Modified on 3/26/2009 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES; VACATING DEADLINES AND DATES SET FORTH IN NOVEMBER 26, 2008 ORDER. The Court vacates the deadlines and dates set forth in the November 26, 2008 order, including t he Case Management Conference, scheduled for March 20, 2009. Said deadlines and dates will be reset after the Court has resolved defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF MICHAEL M. MARKMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 12 Order of Referral deeming cases not related. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/18/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL. The matter is referred to the Honorable Ronald M. Whyte for consideration of whether the case is related to Trend Micro Inc. v. Fortinet, Inc., 04-1785 RMW. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortinet, Inc. v. Trend Micro Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortinet, Inc.
Represented By: Stefani Elise Shanberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trend Micro Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?