Rodriguez v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Donald R. Rodriguez
Defendant: State of California and California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 3:2008cv05390
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 MOTION Administrative Motion and Stipulation for Order Taking Settlement Conference Off Calendar filed by Donald R. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge JAMES LARSON on 5/16/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is continued until April 29, 2011, provided such continuance shall not, by itself, constitute good cause to continue any other deadline or date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file his Second Amended Complaint, in the form annexed as Appendix A to his moving papers, no later than December 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TRIAL DATE AND CASE SCHEDULE. Good cause exists to extend the schedule: Jury Trial - October 17, 2011; Non-expert Discovery Cutoff - March 30, 2011; Designation of Experts - April 21, 2011; Expert Rebuttal - May 18, 2011; Expert Discovery Cutoff - June 17, 2011; Deadline to File Dispositive Motions - July 22, 2011; Settlement Conference - April or early May 2011; Pretrial Conference - October 4, 2011; Meet and Confer - September 6, 2011; Further Status Conference - August 5, 2011; Further Status Conference Statement Due - July 29, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. All proceedings in this action are stayed until four weeks from the date an attorney is appointed to represent plaintiff. The March 12, 2010 hearing on plaintiff's motion is vacated, and no party shall appear on March 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR PRO SE, Attorney Steven R. Levy terminated.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/22/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 28, 2009 to November 6, 2009. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim, and with leave to amend to name individual defendants. Any First Amended Complaint shall be f iled no later than June 26, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 17, 2009 to August 28, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than June 5, 2009, why the complaint should no t be dismissed for failure to state a claim; defendants shall file any reply to plaintiff's response no later than June 12, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 5, 2009 to July 17, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 10, 2009.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/27/2009 at 01:30 PM, and Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/9/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R. Rodriguez
Represented By: Steven R. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?