Lopez v. United Parcel Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ben Lopez
Defendant: United Parcel Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv05396
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 JUDGMENT: A jury verdict in favor of defendant and against plaintiff as to certain claims was entered on 4/21/10. Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law, determining that defendant prevailed over plaintiff on plaintiff's remaining UCL claim, was entered on 9/14/10. Accordingly, judgment is entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff in this action (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER RE: POST-TRIAL MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 INSTRUCTIONS TO JURY (FINAL) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 INSTRUCTIONS TO JURY (DRAFT) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER re Exhibits re 203 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re: exhibits (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND MOTION TO SET ORDER OF PROOF AT TRIAL re 119 , 121 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER extending mediation deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. United Parcel Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Lopez
Represented By: Mark Christopher Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Services, Inc.
Represented By: M. Kirby C. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?