Tri-Valley Cares v. United States Department of Energy et al
Plaintiff: Tri-Valley Cares
Defendant: United States Department of Energy and National Nuclear Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2008cv05408
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Freedom of Information Act Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/9/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating the Summary Judgment hearing on 11/19/10 and setting a Further Case Management Conference for 11/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/24/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 10/22/10 are continued to 11/19/10 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/19/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Cross Motions for Summary Judgment set for 7/23/10 are continued to 10/22/10 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/20/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating the Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/19/10. Setting Cross Motions for Summary Judgment hearing on 7/23/10 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's Motion to be filed by 4/16/10; Defendants' Cross-Motion and Opposition due by 5/17/10; Plaintiff's Cross-Opposition and Reply due by 6/16/10. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/18/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 2/19/10 is continued to 3/19/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/16/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 12/4/09 is continued to 2/19/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/23/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: adding Scott Yundt and terminating Robert Schwartz for Plaintiff Tri-Valley Cares. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/8/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri-Valley Cares v. United States Department of Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri-Valley Cares
Represented By: Robert John Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Nuclear Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?