Leong v. Lykiardopolous et al
Plaintiff: Mireille Leong
Defendant: Gregory Lykiardopolous and Triton Distribution Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv05453
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISSAL OF ACTION with prejudice, pursuant to a Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/23/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why motion to enforce settlement agreement, Doc #41, should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 11/20/2009. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEAL CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IN CONJUNCTION WITH MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT doc re 40 filed by Mireille Leong. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/1/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Telephonic Appearance of Insurance Carrier Representative at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/17/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND AMENDED ORDER RE PROTECTIVE ORDER, re doc 33 filed by Triton Distribution Systems, Inc., Gregory Lykiardopolous. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/5/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER withdrawing 20 and amending complaint pursuant to stipulation (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/30/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 1 Complaint. Order amending complaint. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leong v. Lykiardopolous et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mireille Leong
Represented By: Richard Martin Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lykiardopolous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Distribution Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?