Harkonen v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: W. Scott Harkonen
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv05458
Filed: December 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/2/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 2/3/2009 for parties to file any petition to compel arbitration; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/21/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER extencing time to 1/20/2009 for parties to file petition to compel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 1/6/2009 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harkonen v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Scott Harkonen
Represented By: Marcus Sanders Topel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?