Williams v. United Airlines Employee Welfare Benefit Plan
Plaintiff: Joan Williams
Defendant: United Airlines Employee Welfare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 3:2008cv05594
Filed: December 16, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of the above-titled action, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims against defendant be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any par ty hereto shall certify to this Court, within sixty days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 11, 2009 to November 6, 2009. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE: PARTICIPATING IN APRIL 3, 2009 CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United Airlines Employee Welfare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Williams
Represented By: Peter Steffens Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Employee Welfare Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?