Holmes v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Monica Holmes
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv05619
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/10/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE TIME TO SUBMIT PROPOSED POST-TRIAL FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 108 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/2/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Settlement Conference set for 6/9/2010 10:00 AM.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/28/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY MOTION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S PHONE RECORDS re 57 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/16/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/26/10. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 29 Defendant's Motion for Order for Release of San Francisco Police Department Photographs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/26/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 27 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES re 25 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/3/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE re 17 Stipulation filed by Monica Holmes. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/22/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 11 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by United States of America, CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Holmes
Represented By: Martin L. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?