Barber et al v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Plaintiff: Valerie Barber and Robert Hamilton
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa, County of Sonoma, Edwin Flint, Gregory Yaeger, Michael Heiser, Gregg Ayer and Telecare Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv05649
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The action is dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to the Court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/16/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Granting Defendants' motion 69 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 3, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/30/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT JAMES KENNEDY, M.D. AND ORDER. Good cause appearing, it is ordered that Defendant James Kennedy, M.D. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/22/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING FURTHER HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. By stipulation, further hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment shall be held on December 3, 2010. Defendants will file a supplemental brief in support on or before November 10, 2010. Plaintiffs' will file a supplemental brief in opposition on or before Nobevember 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/18/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT. The parties' stipulation to dismiss all claims against defendants County of Sonoma and James F. Kennedy is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT WITNESS DEADLINES. The parties' stipulation extending expert witness discovery deadlines is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/26/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Defendant James Kennedy M.D.'s motion to dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 28, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR LEAD COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME. The Court will hear the "Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates" on December 11, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs' FAC shall be filed no later than September 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/3/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The deadline to complete Early Neutral Evaluation is 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber et al v. City of Santa Rosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Barber
Represented By: Laura Herron Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hamilton
Represented By: Laura Herron Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Yaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Heiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telecare Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?