Russell et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Saskia Russell, Hudson Russell, Maverick Russell and Brodin Russell
Defendant: United States of America, United States Coast Guard and Coast Guard Maintenance and Logistics Command Pacific
Case Number: 3:2008cv05651
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/08/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 48 Application for order approving minors' compromise. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/18/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER for supplemental briefing from Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental declaration re: 48 Plaintiffs' Application For Order Approving Minors' Compromise on or before 08/20/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/17/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER for compromise settlement and releases. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/22/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue summary judgment briefing and hearing date. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/16/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/02/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending certain fact discovery deadlines. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CORRECTION OF ORDER # 27 by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 23 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting ADR process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/27/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/11/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending federal defendants' time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/01/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saskia Russell
Represented By: Clayton William Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Russell
Represented By: Clayton William Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Russell
Represented By: Clayton William Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brodin Russell
Represented By: Clayton William Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Coast Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Guard Maintenance and Logistics Command Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?