Rosales v. SmithKline Beecham Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Janice Rosales
Defendant: SmithKline Beecham Corporation and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv05658
Filed: December 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MDL ORDER(CTO-32) Transferring Case to Eastern District of Pennsylvania (In Re: Avandia Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation; MDL 1871). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER statistically closing action pending MDL resolution; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/6/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 18 defendants' Motion to Stay proceedings pending transfer to MDL (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time, to 30 days after remand order/transfer order, for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/9/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosales v. SmithKline Beecham Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Rosales
Represented By: Lowell W. Finson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmithKline Beecham Corporation
Represented By: Alan Jay Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?