Rutledge v. Barnes

Petitioner: Tom Rutledge
Respondent: R E Barnes
Case Number: 3:2008cv05738
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING 36 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
October 19, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY REOPEN ACTION; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 19, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
December 17, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/16/08 ORDERING that case is TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R E Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tom Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?